Governance
The Governors at Our Lady of Walsingham Catholic Primary School are the strategic leaders of the school and they have a vital role to play in making sure every child gets the best possible education.
The Governors work closely in partnership with the headteacher, staff, pupils, and parents. It has a collective, legal responsibility for the effective management of the school, acting within a framework established by national legislation and the school’s agreed policies, and ensuring all statutory duties are met.
The Education Act 2002 states that the purpose of maintained school governing bodies is to 'conduct the school with a view to promoting high standards of educational achievement at the school'.
In all types of schools, governing bodies focus on three core strategic functions:
-
Ensuring clarity of vision, ethos and strategic direction.
-
Holding the headteacher to account for the educational performance of the school and its pupils, and the performance management of staff.
-
Overseeing the financial performance of the school and making sure its money is well spent.
Name | Role | Term Ends | Responsibility | Other Interests |
Carol Kenton |
Acting Chairperson Foundation Governor |
04/2025 | Admissions | None Recorded |
Martin Hiddleston | Foundation Governor | 12/2026 | H & S / Facilities | None Recorded |
Claire Sime | Foundation Governor | 02/2027 | Headteacher at a school in Liverpool | |
Claire Fitzsimons | Parent Governor | 02/2027 | SEN | |
Suzanne Marr | Parent Governor | 12/2025 | Pupil Premium | |
Sarah Lawton | LEA Governor | 12/2026 | EYFS | |
A M Fitzgibbon | Staff Governor | 09/2027 | ||
Collette Simms | Headteacher | N/A | ||
Karen Symes | Foundation Governor | 01/2028 | ||
Joanne Welsh | Foundation Governor | 01/2028 | ||
2 vacancies | Foundation Governor |
Historical Governors List
Name | Reason for Leaving | Type of Governor | Leaving Date |
C Luney | End of term | Foundation | 2nd March 2023 |
C Butler | Resigned | Staff | 31st August 2023 |
C Byrne | Resigned | Foundation | 4th May 2023 |
E Criddle | End of term | Foundation | 1st January 2023 |
J Lindsay | Resigned | Observer (AHT) | 31st August 2023 |